NV AB469 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 62.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to health care; limiting the amount a provider of health care may charge a person who has health insurance for certain medically necessary emergency services provided when the provider is out-of-network; requiring an insurer to arrange for the transfer of a person who has health insurance to an in-network facility under certain circumstances; prescribing procedures for determining the amount that an insurer is required to pay a provider of health care which is out-of-network for certain medically necessary emergency services provided to an insured; requiring the reporting of certain information related to that process; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing billing for certain medically necessary emergency services. (BDR 40-704)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 62.
2019-05-15AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-14AssemblySenate Amendment No. 694 concurred in. To enrollment.
2019-05-14AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-05-14SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-05-14SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
2019-05-13SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 694.) To printer.
2019-05-13SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-13SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2019-04-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 3, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 587.) To printer.
2019-04-22AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-10AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-25AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback