NV AB461 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 349.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 349.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates Peace Week in the State of Nevada. (BDR 19-1037)
Title
Designates Peace Week in the State of Nevada. (BDR 19-1037)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-04 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 349. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-29 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 739 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 739.) To printer. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | To committee. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |