NV AB46 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the judicial system; increasing prospectively the base salaries of justices of the Supreme Court, the judges of the Court of Appeals and the district judges in this State; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases annual base salaries for certain justices and judges. (BDR 1-500)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Assembly(No further action taken.)
2019-02-25AssemblyNotice of exemption.
2019-02-22AssemblyRereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
2019-02-22AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2019-02-04AssemblyRead first time. To committee.
2018-11-20AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-11-16AssemblyPrefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback