NV AB459 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education; requiring the Department of Education to establish a mechanism to search certain types of data; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expands certain reporting requirements relating to the performance and achievement of pupils. (BDR 34-795)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Assembly(No further action taken.)
2019-04-16AssemblyRereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee.
2019-04-16AssemblyTaken from General File.
2019-04-16AssemblyRead second time.
2019-04-16AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-04-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-25AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback