NV AB456 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 591.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 591.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to wages; increasing the minimum wage paid to employees in private employment in this State; revising provisions governing the administration and enforcement of the minimum wage provisions; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Increases the minimum wage required to be paid to employees in private employment in this State. (BDR 53-1104)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Chapter 591. |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 7, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 12, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 904.) To printer. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | Waiver granted effective: April 12, 2019. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |