NV AB452 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 497.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 497.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to ethical standards in government; revising provisions governing ethical standards for certain public officers, candidates and lobbyists; making various changes relating to lobbying; authorizing the Legislative Commission to adopt regulations to provide certain exemptions and exceptions from the provisions governing lobbying; revising provisions governing the filing by a lobbyist of a supplemental registration statement; revising provisions governing financial disclosure statements filed by certain candidates and public officers; codifying in statute certain existing agency interpretations of the provisions governing lobbying and financial disclosure statements; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing ethical standards for certain public officers, candidates and lobbyists. (BDR 17-1103)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Chapter 497. |
2019-06-07 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | To printer. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 877.) |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | Exempt pursuant to subsection 4 of Joint Standing Rule 14.6. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |