NV AB452 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 118.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 118.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Legislative Committee on Energy to conduct an interim study concerning energy choice. (BDR S-1113)
Title
Directs the Legislative Committee on Energy to conduct an interim study concerning energy choice. (BDR S-1113)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 118. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read third time. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.) To Senate. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-14 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-13 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-12 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |