NV AB449 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation; revising provisions governing the correction of the tax roll and issuance of credits or refunds of property taxes when an applicable partial abatement of taxes was not applied or claimed; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Authorizes a credit or refund of property taxes under certain circumstances when an applicable partial abatement of taxes was not applied or claimed. (BDR 32-767)
Sponsors
Rep. Danielle Gallant [R] | Rep. Ken Gray [R] | Sen. Carrie Buck [R] | Rep. Jill Dickman [R] |
Rep. Reuben D'Silva [D] | Rep. Richard McArthur [R] | Sen. Ira Hansen [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2023-06-03 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2023-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.) To Senate. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 446.) To printer. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To printer. |