NV AB449 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 282.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 282.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Public Lands Day in the State of Nevada. (BDR 19-770)
Title
Establishes Public Lands Day in the State of Nevada. (BDR 19-770)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 282. |
2017-05-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 876 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 876.) To printer. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 1, Excused: 3.) To Senate. |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 347.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-10 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer. |