NV AB445 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to financial administration; transferring the Office of Grant Procurement, Coordination and Management in the Department of Administration to the Office of the Governor; renaming the Office as the Office of Federal Assistance; requiring the Governor to appoint a Director of the Office; requiring the Director to develop a State Plan for Maximizing Federal Assistance; revising the duties of the Office relating to the procurement, coordination and management of federal assistance; creating the Nevada Grant Matching Program to provide funds to certain public agencies, tribal governments and nonprofit organizations as matching funds for federal grants; requiring that certain money from the Abandoned Property Trust Account be transferred to a trust fund established as part of the Program; revising the membership and duties of the Nevada Advisory Council on Federal Assistance; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to financial administration. (BDR 18-862)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-21AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2021-04-19AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 359.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2021-04-19AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-04-08AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2021-03-30AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2021-03-29AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback