NV AB444 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to legislative affairs; creating the Legislative Committee on Tax Expenditures and Incentives for Economic Development; setting forth the composition and administration of the Committee; prescribing the powers and duties of the Committee; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the Legislative Committee on Tax Expenditures and Incentives for Economic Development. (BDR 17-767)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14AssemblyVetoed by the Governor.
2019-06-06AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-06-03AssemblySenate Amendment No. 1084 concurred in. To enrollment.
2019-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-06-02SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 15, Nays: 6.) To Assembly.
2019-06-02SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
2019-06-01SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1084.) To printer.
2019-06-01SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-06-01SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-05-27SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
2019-05-27SenateIn Senate.
2019-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-24AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 834.) To printer.
2019-05-23AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-23AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-08AssemblyExempt pursuant to subsection 4 of Joint Standing Rule 14.6.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-25AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback