NV AB441 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to taxes. (BDR 32-710)
Title
Revises provisions relating to taxes. (BDR 32-710)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-04-12 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/history.cfm?ID=987 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/AB/AB441.pdf |