NV AB44 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 530.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to state lands; creating the Stewart Indian School Cultural Center and Museum; providing provisions governing the Museum Director; requiring the Museum Director to engage in certain duties relating to the Museum; authorizing the Museum Director to establish a store for the sale of gifts and souvenirs; authorizing the Museum Director to establish certain accounts; granting the Executive Director of the Nevada Indian Commission the authority to appoint and supervise the Museum Director; revising provisions governing the Nevada Indian Commission's Gift Fund; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts provisions relating to the administration of the Stewart Indian School land and facilities. (BDR 18-188)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10AssemblyChapter 530.
2019-06-08AssemblyApproved by the Governor.
2019-06-03AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2019-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2019-05-30SenateRead second time.
2019-05-30SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-05-28SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
2019-05-28SenateIn Senate.
2019-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-28AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2019-05-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-03-11AssemblyRereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee.
2019-03-11AssemblyTaken from General File.
2019-03-11AssemblyRead second time.
2019-03-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-02-25AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-02-04AssemblyRead first time. To committee.
2018-11-20AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-11-16AssemblyPrefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback