NV AB44 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 275.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions governing judgments by confession. (BDR 6-491)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing judgments by confession. (BDR 6-491)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-29AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 275.
2015-05-28AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-05-26AssemblyTo enrollment.
2015-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2015-05-21SenateTaken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
2015-05-16SenateTaken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
2015-05-15SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2015-05-14SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2015-05-13SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2015-05-12SenateRead second time.
2015-05-11SenateTaken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.
2015-05-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-04-06SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2015-04-06SenateIn Senate.
2015-04-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2015-04-02AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-04-01AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 36.) To printer.
2015-03-30AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-02-02AssemblyRead first time. To committee.
2014-12-22AssemblyFrom printer.
2014-12-20AssemblyPrefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback