NV AB44 | 2013 | 77th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 288.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions governing the storage of trash and recycling containers in certain planned communities. (BDR 10-262)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing the storage of trash and recycling containers in certain planned communities. (BDR 10-262)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-01AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 288.
2013-05-31AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2013-05-29AssemblyTo enrollment.
2013-05-28AssemblySenate Amendment No. 627 concurred in.
2013-05-23AssemblyIn Assembly.
2013-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2013-05-22SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
2013-05-21SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 627.) To printer.
2013-05-21SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2013-05-21SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2013-04-19SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2013-04-19SenateIn Senate.
2013-04-18AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2013-04-18AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2013-04-17AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 247.) To printer.
2013-04-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2013-02-04AssemblyRead first time. To committee.
2012-12-27AssemblyFrom printer.
2012-12-20AssemblyPrefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback