NV AB432 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 132.
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 132.
Summary
Revises provisions governing alcoholic beverage awareness programs. (BDR 32-526)
Title
Revises provisions governing alcoholic beverage awareness programs. (BDR 32-526)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 132. | |
2009-05-15 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Amendment No. 602 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-13 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-12 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Not voting: 1.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-12 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-11 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 602.) To printer. | |
2009-05-08 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-20 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2009-04-20 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-17 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-17 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-16 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 414.) To printer. | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-16 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-23 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2009-03-18 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=821 |