NV AB431 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 392.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 392.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing alcoholic beverages. (BDR 52-1018)
Title
Revises provisions governing alcoholic beverages. (BDR 52-1018)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 392. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-29 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 783 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 783.) To printer. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 541.) To printer. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |