NV AB429 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 131.
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 131.
Summary
Revises provisions governing the required minimum expenditures for textbooks, instructional supplies and instructional hardware. (BDR 34-855)
Title
Revises provisions governing the required minimum expenditures for textbooks, instructional supplies and instructional hardware. (BDR 34-855)
Sponsors
Rep. Bernie Anderson [D] | Rep. Barbara Buckley [D] | Sen. Heidi Gansert [R] | Sen. Joseph Hardy [R] |
Sen. Sheila Leslie [D] | Sen. Bernice Mathews [D] | Rep. Bonnie Parnell [D] | Sen. Debbie Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 131. | |
2009-05-15 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-13 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-12 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-11 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-08 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-06 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-05 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-04 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-14 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. | |
2009-04-14 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-13 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Not voting: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-10 | Read second time. | |
2009-04-10 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-10 | From Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means: Do pass. | |
2009-03-27 | To Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2009-03-27 | From Concurrent Committee on Education: Do pass. | |
2009-03-18 | From printer. To committees. | |
2009-03-16 | Read first time. Referred to Concurrent Committees on Education and Ways and Means. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=817 |