NV AB426 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to State Government; creating the Committee on Systems Integration within the Office of Science, Innovation and Technology; prescribing the membership and duties of the Committee; revising provisions relating to the duties of the Director of the Office; making an appropriation; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the Committee on Systems Integration within the Office of Science, Innovation and Technology. (BDR 18-1121)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Assembly(No further action taken.)
2019-04-16AssemblyRereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee.
2019-04-16AssemblyTaken from General File.
2019-04-16AssemblyRead second time.
2019-04-15AssemblyFrom committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-31AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-25AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback