NV AB425 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; establishing the Criminal Forfeiture of Minor Currency Act; revising provisions relating to the civil forfeiture of certain currency attributable to certain crimes; authorizing the Peace Officers' Standards and Training Commission to require training of peace officers regarding the Act; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Establishes provisions relating to the criminal forfeiture of certain currency used in or derived from unlawful acts relating to the transportation, sale or trafficking of controlled substances. (BDR 14-483)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 470.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-09 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-03-29 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |