NV AB422 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Chapter 554.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Chapter 554.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to elections; requiring the Secretary of State to create a centralized database that collects and stores voter preregistration and registration information from all of the counties; requiring each county clerk to use the database created by the Secretary of State to collect and store preregistration and registration information; making various other changes related to the creation and use of the database created by the Secretary of State; revising provisions governing risk-limiting audits of elections; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes relating to elections. (BDR 24-1040)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Assembly | Chapter 554. |
2021-06-11 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 813 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | To printer. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 813.) |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2021-04-16 | Assembly | To committee. |
2021-04-16 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 277.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |