NV AB421 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-15 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to taxation; providing for the imposition, administration and payment of an excise tax on the collection of the consumer data of individual Nevada consumers by a commercial data collector; requiring a person who owed the tax on the collection of the consumer data of individual Nevada consumers to register with the Department of Taxation; requiring the Department to maintain an Internet website containing certain information with respect to persons who register with the Department as commercial data collectors; providing penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes provisions governing the collection of the consumer data of Nevada consumers. (BDR 32-561)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-15Assembly(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
2023-04-11AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2023-03-28AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2023-03-27AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback