NV AB421 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Chapter 361.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Chapter 361.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to construction; revising provisions relating to the information required to be included in a notice of a constructional defect; removing provisions requiring the presence of an expert during an inspection of an alleged constructional defect; establishing provisions relating to a claimant pursuing a claim under a builder's warranty; removing certain provisions governing the tolling of statutes of limitation and repose regarding actions for constructional defects; revising provisions relating to the recovery of damages proximately caused by a constructional defect; increasing the period during which an action for the recovery of certain damages may be commenced; revising the prohibition against a unit-owners' association pursuing an action for a constructional defect unless the action pertains exclusively to the common elements of the association; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to construction. (BDR 3-841)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Assembly | Chapter 361. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Senate Amendment Nos. 808 and 963 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-25 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. To Assembly. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | To printer. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 963.) |
2019-05-24 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 808.) To printer. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | To printer. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 13, Excused: 2.) |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 640.) Dispensed with reprinting. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |