NV AB421 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 558.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to corrections. (BDR 16-1058)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to corrections. (BDR 16-1058)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 558.
2017-06-08AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-04AssemblySenate Amendment No. 1105 concurred in. To enrollment.
2017-06-04AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-06-04SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-06-04SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint .
2017-06-03SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1105.) To printer.
2017-06-03SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-06-03SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-05-29SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2017-05-29SenateIn Senate.
2017-05-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 5, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2017-05-25AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 949.) To printer.
2017-05-24AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-23AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass, as amended.
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-04-24AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 621.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2017-04-24AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-10AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-03-28AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-27AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Corrections, Parole, and Probation. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback