NV AB420 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; establishing a uniform procedure for the criminal forfeiture of property used or obtained in certain crimes; providing for the distribution of forfeited property and proceeds from the sale of such property; requiring the reporting of certain information relating to the forfeiture of property; revising provisions authorizing the forfeiture of property; repealing certain provisions governing the seizure, forfeiture and disposition of property and proceeds; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing the criminal forfeiture of property. (BDR 14-717)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Senate(No further action taken.)
2019-05-28SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-05-28SenateIn Senate.
2019-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 6, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-27AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-27AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2019-05-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass, as amended.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 310.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2019-04-22AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-04-22AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-25AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback