NV AB418 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; requiring the Department of Education to develop, implement and analyze an exit survey for certain employees who leave employment at a school district; authorizing the Department to partner with certain persons or entities to develop, implement and analyze the results of such exit surveys; requiring the board of trustees of a school district to administer and report to the Department the results of an exit survey; requiring the Department to make certain recommendations to the board of trustees of a school district; requiring the Department to report certain information to the Legislature or the Legislative Committee on Education; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Enacts provisions relating to education. (BDR 34-526)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 304.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |