NV AB416 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 390.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; revising provisions relating to the collection of delinquent fines, administrative assessments, fees or restitution; authorizing a court to order the performance of community service in lieu of all or a part of any administrative assessment or fee in certain circumstances; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to the imposition and collection of fines, administrative assessments, fees or restitution. (BDR 14-429)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 390.
2019-06-02AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-28AssemblySenate Amendment Nos. 906 and 907 concurred in. To enrollment.
2019-05-27AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-05-25SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. To Assembly.
2019-05-24SenateTo printer.
2019-05-24SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.)
2019-05-24SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2019-05-24SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 907.)
2019-05-24SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
2019-05-23SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 906.) To printer.
2019-05-23SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-23SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 8, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 366.) To printer.
2019-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-25AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback