NV AB415 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Public Employees' Retirement System; revising provisions governing the adjustment of contribution rates; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to the Public Employees' Retirement System. (BDR 23-1110)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2019-03-31 | Assembly | Notice of exemption. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/80th2019/Bill/6793/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/AB/AB415.pdf |