NV AB412 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to public financial administration. (BDR 31-963)
Title
Revises provisions relating to public financial administration. (BDR 31-963)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 432.) To printer. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2015-03-20 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-17 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer. |