NV AB412 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 29.
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 29.
Summary
Makes certain changes concerning the towing of occupied vehicles. (BDR 43-111)
Title
Makes certain changes concerning the towing of occupied vehicles. (BDR 43-111)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 29. | |
2009-05-02 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-01 | Senate Amendment No. 515 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-01 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-29 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-28 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-27 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-24 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 515.) To printer. | |
2009-04-22 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-14 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To committee. | |
2009-04-14 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-13 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-10 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-09 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-06 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-02 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-01 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-03-31 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-03-30 | Read second time. | |
2009-03-27 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-03-18 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=800 |