NV AB408 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts provisions relating to certain uses of land and the exercise of law enforcement authority in this State. (BDR 26-1060)
Title
Enacts provisions relating to certain uses of land and the exercise of law enforcement authority in this State. (BDR 26-1060)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 8 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 8 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 8 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 8, Nays: 34.) |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Amendment No. 595 not adopted. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Amendment No. 642 not adopted. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Read third time. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 421.) To printer. |
2015-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2015-03-20 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-17 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer. |