NV AB407 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 162. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the Department of Motor Vehicles; prohibiting the Director of the Department of Motor Vehicles from releasing any personal information from the files or records of the Department for any purpose relating to the enforcement of immigration laws, except under certain circumstances; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing the release of personal information by the Director of the Department of Motor Vehicles. (BDR 43-751)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-01AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 162. (Effective July 1, 2023)
2023-05-26AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2023-05-23AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2023-05-23SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 8, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2023-05-22SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2023-05-19SenateRead second time.
2023-05-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2023-04-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee.
2023-04-24SenateIn Senate.
2023-04-21AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 14, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
2023-04-21AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2023-04-20AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 212.) To printer.
2023-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2023-03-28AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2023-03-27AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback