NV AB407 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Designates the state land grant institutions in this State and requires a legislative audit of cooperative extension programs. (BDR 49-1162)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates the state land grant institutions in this State and requires a legislative audit of cooperative extension programs. (BDR 49-1162)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12AssemblyVetoed by the Governor.
2017-06-08AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-04AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2017-06-04SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 15, Nays: 6.) To Assembly.
2017-06-03SenateRead second time.
2017-06-03SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-06-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-06-02SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
2017-06-02SenateIn Senate.
2017-06-02AssemblyTo Senate.
2017-06-02AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2017-06-02AssemblyTo printer.
2017-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 12.)
2017-06-02AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2017-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1074.)
2017-06-02AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2017-06-02AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-04-24AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 472.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2017-04-24AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-10AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-03-22AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-20AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback