NV AB406 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - In Assembly. To enrollment.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the Airport Authority of Carson City; revising provisions relating to the appointment of members of the Board of Trustees of the Authority; revising the powers of the Board; revising provisions governing procedures concerning employment; removing an obsolete transitory provision; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes various changes relating to the Airport Authority of Carson City. (BDR S-50)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2019-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-05-21SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-20SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-16SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-15SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-14SenateRead second time.
2019-05-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
2019-04-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 559.) To printer.
2019-04-22AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2019-04-22AssemblyTaken from Chief Clerk's desk.
2019-04-18AssemblyPlaced on Chief Clerk's desk.
2019-04-18AssemblyTaken from General File.
2019-04-18AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-17AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 368.) To printer.
2019-04-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-22AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-21AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback