NV AB406 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to certain construction. (BDR 28-781)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to certain construction. (BDR 28-781)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06Assembly(No further action taken.)
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-04-24AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 490.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2017-04-24AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-13AssemblyWaiver granted effective: April 12, 2017.
2017-04-12AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-03-22AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-20AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback