NV AB4 | 2020 | 32nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to elections; enacting provisions for conducting elections adversely affected by certain emergencies or disasters; revising provisions governing election procedures for absent ballots, mailing ballots and other mail ballots; making various other changes relating to elections; prohibiting certain unlawful acts relating to elections; providing for the transfer, disbursement and use of certain funds to pay certain expenses relating to elections; providing penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to elections. (BDR 24-13)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-03AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 3.
2020-08-02AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2020-08-02AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2020-08-02SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To Assembly.
2020-08-01SenateRead second time.
2020-07-31SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2020-07-31SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee of the Whole. To committee.
2020-07-31SenateIn Senate.
2020-07-31AssemblyTo Senate.
2020-07-31AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2020-07-31AssemblyTo printer.
2020-07-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 29, Nays: 12, Excused: 1.)
2020-07-31AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2020-07-31AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 2.)
2020-07-31AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2020-07-31AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2020-07-31AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2020-07-31AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee of the Whole. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback