NV AB4 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to cities; authorizing a governing body of a city to create a district for a city fire department; requiring the governing body of a city that creates a district for a city fire department to establish the boundaries of that district; authorizing the governing body of a city that creates a district for a city fire department to levy a tax for the support of the district; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes cities to create a district for a city fire department. (BDR 21-459)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Assembly(No further action taken.)
2019-04-15AssemblyWaiver granted effective: April 12, 2019.
2019-02-04AssemblyRead first time. To committee.
2018-11-18AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-11-15AssemblyPrefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback