NV AB399 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 575.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Nevada State Infrastructure Bank and revises provisions relating to certain public works. (BDR 35-1129)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Nevada State Infrastructure Bank and revises provisions relating to certain public works. (BDR 35-1129)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-13AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 575.
2017-06-08AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05AssemblySenate Amendment Nos. 1135 and 1156 concurred in. To enrollment.
2017-06-05AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-06-05SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Fourth reprint . To Assembly.
2017-06-05SenateTo printer.
2017-06-05SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.)
2017-06-05SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2017-06-05SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1156.)
2017-06-05SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint .
2017-06-04SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1135.) To printer.
2017-06-04SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-06-04SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-06-01SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate.
2017-06-01AssemblyTo Senate.
2017-06-01AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2017-06-01AssemblyTo printer.
2017-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 4, Excused: 3.)
2017-06-01AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2017-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1040.)
2017-06-01AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2017-06-01AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-04-24AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 604.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2017-04-24AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-10AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-03-22AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-20AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/history.cfm?ID=884
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/AB/AB399.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/AB/AB399_R1.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/AB/AB399_R2.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/AB/AB399_R3.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/AB/AB399_R4.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/AB/AB399_EN.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1209&fldReprint=2&fldDocTypeCode=AB&fldBillNumber=399&fldBillname=AB399
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1396&fldReprint=3&fldDocTypeCode=AB&fldBillNumber=399&fldBillname=AB399

Bill Comments

feedback