NV AB399 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 459.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 459.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Office of Economic Development to create a pilot program to encourage the growth of existing businesses in this State. (BDR S-46)
Title
Directs the Office of Economic Development to create a pilot program to encourage the growth of existing businesses in this State. (BDR S-46)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-09 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 459. |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | To enrollment. |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-05-31 | Assembly | To printer. |
2015-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 8, Excused: 2.) |
2015-05-31 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2015-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 997.) |
2015-05-31 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2015-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | To committee. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | Exemption effective. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2015-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2015-03-20 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-17 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer. |