NV AB396 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises certain provisions relating to public officers and candidates for public office. (BDR 17-893)
Title
Revises certain provisions relating to public officers and candidates for public office. (BDR 17-893)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Notice of exemption. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |