NV AB395 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 477.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 477.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing juvenile justice. (BDR 5-853)
Title
Revises provisions governing juvenile justice. (BDR 5-853)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 477. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.) To Assembly. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 2, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |