NV AB394 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to elections; requiring the Secretary of State to adopt regulations that prescribe the procedure to be used if the abstract or certification of results for any election is not timely prepared or transmitted; prohibiting, with certain exceptions, the counting of ballots more than once; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing elections. (BDR 24-776)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | Bill read with Governor's veto message. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To Assembly. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. |
2023-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.) To Senate. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2023-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-03-24 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |