NV AB392 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-27 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-27 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to property; prohibiting certain deceptive service agreements between an owner of residential property and a service provider; revising provisions governing persons who hold a permit to engage in property management; providing penalties; establishing administrative penalties for title insurers, underwritten title companies and employees and representatives thereof who provide certain inducements; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes relating to property. (BDR 10-209)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-21 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-27 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.) |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 642.) To printer. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 289.) To printer. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-24 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |