NV AB391 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to dispensing opticians; authorizing the Board of Dispensing Opticians to employ an Executive Director; providing immunity from civil liability to the Board and any of its members for certain acts; expanding the purposes for which the Board is authorized to accept gifts, grants, donations and contributions; requiring the Board to perform certain duties relating to the issuance, renewal, reinstatement, revocation and suspension of licenses; prescribing requirements for the submission of an application for licensure; requiring the Board to adopt certain regulations relating to licensure; requiring the Board to establish a schedule of fees and charges; prescribing criteria for eligibility for a license as an apprentice dispensing optician; clarifying certain requirements relating to eligibility for a limited license as a dispensing optician; revising criteria for eligibility for a license as a dispensing optician; removing the authority of the Board to issue a special license as a dispensing optician; reorganizing certain provisions; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to dispensing opticians. (BDR 54-659)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01Assembly(No further action taken.)
2021-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly.
2021-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2021-05-20SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2021-05-19SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2021-05-19SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
2021-05-18SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 627.) To printer.
2021-05-18SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-05-18SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-04-22SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2021-04-22SenateIn Senate.
2021-04-21AssemblyTo Senate.
2021-04-21AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2021-04-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 9.) To printer.
2021-04-19AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2021-04-19AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 366.)
2021-04-19AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-03-25AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2021-03-24AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback