NV AB391 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 86.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the crime of bestiality. (BDR 15-29)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the crime of bestiality. (BDR 15-29)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 86.
2017-05-17AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-05-15AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2017-05-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2017-05-09SenateRead second time.
2017-05-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-04-26SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2017-04-26SenateIn Senate.
2017-04-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-24AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 358.) To printer.
2017-04-21AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-23AssemblyRereferred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee.
2017-03-23AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2017-03-22AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-20AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback