NV AB386 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to midwives; establishing the Board of Licensed Certified Professional Midwives and requiring the Board to adopt certain regulations; requiring the Division of Public and Behavioral Health of the Department of Health and Human Services to perform certain tasks relating to the regulation of licensed certified professional midwives; providing for the licensure of licensed certified professional midwives; authorizing a licensed certified professional midwife to utilize a certified professional midwife birth assistant under certain circumstances; prescribing requirements relating to the practice of certified professional midwifery; requiring any midwife who provides services in this State to provide to clients a Community Birth Disclosure; authorizing a licensed certified professional midwife to possess, administer and order certain drugs, devices, chemicals and solutions; creating a special endorsement authorizing a licensed certified professional midwife to order, dispense and implant certain devices; creating a special endorsement authorizing a licensed certified professional midwife to possess, administer, prescribe and dispense certain drugs; exempting a licensed certified professional midwife and other providers of health care from certain liability; prohibiting certain persons from performing midwifery; requiring Medicaid to cover the services of a licensed certified professional midwife; authorizing a licensed certified professional midwife to serve as the director of a freestanding birthing center; specifying the midwives to which certain requirements apply; providing a penalty; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to midwives. (BDR 54-111)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-08 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | To printer. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Action of passage reconsidered. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 975.) |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Read second time. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-06-03 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2023-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 31, Nays: 11.) To Senate. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | To Chief Clerk's desk. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | To printer. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 868.) |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 442.) To printer. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-11 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |