NV AB385 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 486.
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 486.
Summary
Makes various changes concerning prisons. (BDR 16-523)
Title
Makes various changes concerning prisons. (BDR 16-523)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-09 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 486. | |
2009-06-04 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-06-03 | To enrollment. | |
2009-06-03 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint. | |
2009-06-03 | To printer. | |
2009-06-02 | Conference report adopted by Senate. | |
2009-06-01 | From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 975 and further amend. Conference report adopted by Assembly. | |
2009-05-31 | Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee. | |
2009-05-31 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-31 | Senate Amendment No. 975 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly. | |
2009-05-31 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-30 | Senate Amendment No. 975 not concurred in. To Senate. | |
2009-05-30 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-30 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-30 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-30 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. | |
2009-05-30 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 975.) To printer. | |
2009-05-30 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-30 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-05-28 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2009-05-28 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-28 | To Senate. | |
2009-05-28 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-28 | To printer. | |
2009-05-28 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 4, Excused: 1.) | |
2009-05-28 | Dispensed with reprinting. | |
2009-05-28 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 952.) | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-05-28 | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-05-28 | Taken from General File. | |
2009-05-28 | Read third time. | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-05-28 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-21 | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. | |
2009-04-21 | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-04-20 | Notice of exemption. | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-04-16 | Taken from General File. | |
2009-04-16 | Action of rereferral rescinded. | |
2009-04-16 | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2009-04-16 | Taken from General File. | |
2009-04-16 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-15 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 362.) To printer. | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-15 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-18 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Corrections, Parole, and Probation. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=763 |