NV AB384 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 340.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 340.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing the consideration of the criminal history of an applicant for employment by the State or a county, city or unincorporated town. (BDR 23-33)
Title
Revises provisions governing the consideration of the criminal history of an applicant for employment by the State or a county, city or unincorporated town. (BDR 23-33)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-03 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 340. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-29 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 952 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 952.) To printer. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 15.) To Senate. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 364.) To printer. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |