NV AB382 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes provisions governing payment for the provision of emergency services and care to patients. (BDR 40-570)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes provisions governing payment for the provision of emergency services and care to patients. (BDR 40-570)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-08AssemblyVetoed by the Governor.
2017-06-08AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-04AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2017-06-04SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly.
2017-06-03SenateRead second time.
2017-06-03SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-06-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-06-01SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate.
2017-06-01AssemblyTo Senate.
2017-06-01AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2017-05-31AssemblyTo printer.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 31, Nays: 10, Excused: 1.)
2017-05-31AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1065.)
2017-05-31AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2017-05-31AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-04-24AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 427.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2017-04-21AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-12AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-03-22AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-20AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback