NV AB380 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 219.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 219.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to sales and use taxes. (BDR 32-964)
Title
Revises provisions relating to sales and use taxes. (BDR 32-964)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-27 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 219. |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To committee. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 9.) To Senate. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Action of rereferral reconsidered. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | To printer. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 431.) |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, without recommendation. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-17 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer. |